VA HB1129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Product safety; flame retardants; regulations; fund; civil penalty. Prohibits the manufacture or sale in the Commonwealth, beginning July 1, 2021, of upholstered furniture intended for residential use or any product that is intended to come into close contact with a person younger than 12 years of age if such upholstered furniture or product contains any flame-retardant chemical listed in the bill. The bill requires the manufacturer of any prohibited product to notify sellers of the prohibition by March 31, 2021, and requires a manufacturer to recall by that date any products that it has sold in violation of the prohibition. Casual or isolated sales of previously owned products containing the listed chemicals are exempted from the prohibition. The bill subjects any manufacturer in the Commonwealth that manufacturers a product in violation of the provisions of the bill to a civil penalty of $5,000 for a first offense or $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense, and it directs the funds collected to the Virginia Product Safety Fund, created by the bill. Finally, the bill directs the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations to carry out the provisions of the chapter and to impose the chemical prohibition on certain other consumer products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Product safety; flame retardants, regulations, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101637D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326600(n/a)See Bill Text
326601(n/a)See Bill Text
326602(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback