VA HB1128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Discharge of deleterious substance into state waters; notice. Requires any person who unlawfully discharges any deleterious substance into state waters to give written notice to the State Water Control Board. Current law requires written notice to be given only to the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill also requires the Board or the Department to give the reported discharge information to local newspapers, television stations, and radio stations as soon as practicable after receiving it.
Title
Discharge of deleterious substance into state waters; notice to State Water Control Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1205-Tran) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101630D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Similar To) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1182)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.19:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1128 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1128+hil |