VA HB1120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; admission, in-state tuition, and tuition waivers; members of certain American Indian tribes. Requires each public institution of higher education to establish and implement an admissions policy whereby a certain number of annual offers of student admission is reserved for individuals who are members of a state-recognized or federally recognized American Indian tribe that is headquartered in the Commonwealth. The bill declares eligible for in-state tuition charges regardless of domicile any non-Virginia student who is a member of a state-recognized or federally recognized American Indian tribe that is headquartered in the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that any student who is a member of a state-recognized or federally recognized American Indian tribe headquartered in the Commonwealth and who has been admitted to a public institution of higher education is eligible for a tuition waiver up to the amount necessary to cover the last-dollar cost of the institution's in-state tuition and mandatory fees after all other federal and state financial aid to which the student is entitled is taken into account.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; admission, in-state tuition, and tuition waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22100531D |
Subjects
Higher Education
Indian Tribes
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Indian Tribes
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 407.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 609.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |