VA HB112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Falsely signing a summons. Provides that a person who signs a summons with a false name is guilty of giving a false identity to a law-enforcement officer, a Class 1 misdemeanor. Currently, such conduct is punished as forging a public record, a Class 4 felony.
Title
Summons; falsely signing, misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102004D |