VA HB1119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Flavored tobacco products; sale prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits the sale, distribution, offering for sale or distribution, or causing the sale or distribution of flavored tobacco products, as that term is defined in the bill, and imposes a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for the first violation, $1000 for a second violation, $1,500 for a third violation, and $2,000 for the fourth or subsequent violation. The bill also provides that, in addition to the civil penalties, a third violation is punishable by suspension of a permit as a stamping agent for a period of 15 days, and a fourth or subsequent violation is punishable by revocation of a permit as a stamping agent and a prohibition on reapplication for a permit to act as a stamping agent for a period of three years. Flavored tobacco products; sale prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits the sale, distribution, offering for sale or distribution, or causing the sale or distribution of flavored tobacco products, as that term is defined in the bill, and imposes a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for the first violation, $1000 for a second violation, $1,500 for a third violation, and $2,000 for the fourth or subsequent violation. The bill also provides that, in addition to the civil penalties, a third violation is punishable by suspension of a permit as a stamping agent for a period of 15 days, and a fourth or subsequent violation is punishable by revocation of a permit as a stamping agent and a prohibition on reapplication for a permit to act as a stamping agent for a period of three years.
Title
Flavored tobacco products; sale prohibited, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104960D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1119 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote