VA HB1118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal background check for transfer of firearms; exemption for holders of concealed handgun permits. Provides that a licensed firearms dealer does not have to have a criminal background check performed to determine a person's eligibility to purchase a firearm if the purchaser possesses a valid concealed handgun permit and presents a photo-ID issued by an agency of the Commonwealth or the Department of Defense.
Title
Firearms; criminal background check for transfer, exemption for holders of concealed permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103155D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1118 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1118+hil |