VA HB1115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minors; education records; disposition; children in need of services. Provides that when a juvenile is alleged to have committed a delinquent act in certain circumstances and a juvenile and domestic relations district court admits evidence related to an Individualized Education Program, a Section 504 Plan, a behavioral intervention plan, or a functional behavioral assessment, if the court makes a finding that the juvenile is responsible because he acted intentionally or willfully when committing the delinquent act, the court shall enter an order of adjudication or an order of disposition, but if the court makes a finding that the juvenile is not responsible because he did not act intentionally or willfully when committing the delinquent act, the court may (i) enter an order of disposition or commitment authorized for children in need of services, (ii) if the juvenile has reached the age of 18 years, enter an order of emergency custody, or (iii) dismiss the petition. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Minors; delinquent act, children in need of services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104184D |