VA HB1114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Colonial Heights. Clarifies that the city's director of finance has the responsibility of collecting all tax payments, fees, assessments, and charges imposed by the city. The city treasurer shall continue to collect all tax returns, tax payments, fees, assessments, and charges imposed by or payable to the Commonwealth. The bill shifts certain duties related to the sale of tax-delinquent property from the city treasurer to the director of finance. The bill provides that (i) the city council may authorize the treasurer to assume duties of the director of finance and (ii) its provisions shall not result in a change in the amount of the treasurer's salary set by the State Compensation Board that is payable by the city for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, or the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018.
Title
Colonial Heights, City of; charter, clarifies responsibilities of director of finance and treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/16 see bill) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1114ER) |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16103842D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1114E |
2016-02-15 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cox agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103842D |