VA HB1108 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
City council salaries. Removes the statutory salary caps for members of city councils.
Title
City council salaries; removes the statutory salary caps for members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (7-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101708D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1414.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1414.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |