VA HB1106 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; misclassification of employees as independent contractors. Authorizes the Attorney General, upon reasonable cause to believe that a person is wrongfully misclassifying employees within the Commonwealth as independent contractors, to conduct an investigation into such possible wrongful misclassification. Upon probable cause that a person has wrongfully misclassified employees within the Commonwealth as independent contractors, the Attorney General shall have the authority to file a complaint in the circuit court where such person is located, seeking recovery of all amounts owed to departments and commissions of Virginia, unpaid wages or overtime for employees, and any other losses of benefits, amounts due under the law, and damages employees suffered due to the wrongful misclassification. The circuit court may award judgment in the amount owed, including prejudgment and postjudgment interest, and assess all costs and reasonable attorney fees against a person who wrongfully misclassified employees as independent contractors.
Title
Attorney General, Office of the; misclassification of employees as independent contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-26 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101871D |