VA HB1101 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 143 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Affordable housing dwelling unit ordinances. Allows certain localities to adopt affordable housing dwelling unit ordinances. The governing body of any locality, other than localities to which certain current affordable housing provisions apply, may by amendment to the zoning ordinances of such locality provide for an affordable housing dwelling unit program. Such program shall address housing needs, promote a full range of housing choices, and encourage the construction and continued existence of housing affordable to low-and-moderate-income citizens by providing for increases in density to the applicant in exchange for the applicant's voluntarily electing to provide such affordable housing. Any local ordinance may authorize the governing body to (i) establish qualifying jurisdiction-wide affordable dwelling unit sales prices based on local market conditions, (ii) establish jurisdiction-wide affordable dwelling unit qualifying income guidelines, and (iii) offer incentives other than density increases, such as reductions or waiver of permit, development, and infrastructure fees, as the governing body deems appropriate to encourage the provision of affordable housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable housing; certain localities allowed to adopt dwelling unit ordinances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 143 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020
2020-02-24SenateSigned by President
2020-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1101ER)
2020-02-21HouseEnrolled
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N)
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1101H1
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107167D-H1
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107167D-H1
2020-01-21HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105278D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522305.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback