VA HB110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; trading allowance reserve account; facilities with long-term contracts. Provides that if the Commonwealth becomes a participant in the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative or another carbon dioxide cap and trade program with an open auction of allowances, the Department of Environmental Quality shall establish an allowance reserve account for any electric generation facility that operates according to a long-term contract that was executed prior to May 16, 2017, and prohibits the recovery of allowance costs. The bill provides that such a facility shall be allocated free allowances from the reserve account sufficient to cover its annual compliance obligation for the duration of the long-term contract.
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; trading allowance reserve account, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101945D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB110 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB110+hil |