VA HB1095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth information security requirements. Requires state public bodies, defined in the bill, to (i) comply with the Commonwealth's security policies and standards, (ii) ensure each of their employees completes information security training, (iii) conduct regular security audits, (iv) report the results of such audits to the appropriate entity, and (v) implement security monitoring and enter into memoranda of understanding with the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth for sharing information with the Commonwealth's central information security systems. The bill directs the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth to (a) publish and maintain a list of the Commonwealth's security policies and standards with which state public bodies are required to comply, (b) ensure that transition meetings with state public bodies occur, and (c) document such transitions and any exemptions from the requirements of the bill. Commonwealth information security requirements. Requires state public bodies, defined in the bill, to (i) comply with the Commonwealth's security policies and standards, (ii) ensure each of their employees completes information security training, (iii) conduct regular security audits, (iv) report the results of such audits to the appropriate entity, and (v) implement security monitoring and enter into memoranda of understanding with the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth for sharing information with the Commonwealth's central information security systems. The bill directs the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth to (a) publish and maintain a list of the Commonwealth's security policies and standards with which state public bodies are required to comply, (b) ensure that transition meetings with state public bodies occur, and (c) document such transitions and any exemptions from the requirements of the bill.
Title
Commonwealth information security; requirements of state public bodies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105090D |