VA HB1094 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception; physician-owned ambulatory surgery center. Exempts physician-owned ambulatory surgery centers, as that term is defined in the bill, from the requirement of obtaining a certificate of public need before undertaking a project.
Title
Certificate of public need; exempts physician-owned ambulatory surgery centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101234D |