VA HB1093 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credit; food crop donations to a food bank. Establishes an individual and corporate income tax credit beginning in 2016 for food crops that are grown by a person engaged in the business of farming and donated by such person to a nonprofit food bank. The credit would equal 30 percent of the fair market value of the food crops donated by the person during the taxable year, not to exceed an aggregate of $5,000 for any taxable year. The bill defines food crops as grains, fruits, nuts, or vegetables. The Department of Taxation will administer the tax credit and may issue up to $250,000 in tax credits each fiscal year. The bill provides for any unused credit to be carried forward for five years. The credit would sunset on January 1, 2022.
Title
Income tax, state and corporate; tax credits for food crop donations to nonprofit food bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0391) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 391 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1093ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2016-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102821D-E |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1093E |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102821D |
Same As/Similar To
SB580 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |