VA HB1092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Physical education; regulations. Requires the Board of Education to promulgate regulations governing physical education requirements in public schools. The Board shall promulgate the regulations to be effective beginning with the 2015 - 2016 school year.
Title
Physical education; Board of Education to develop guidelines governing requirements in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1092ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 16-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 10-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1092ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House (81-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103161D-E | |
2012-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1092E | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103161D |
Same As/Similar To
SB471 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor