VA HB1088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Planning; subdivision of land and zoning. Changes the definition of "subdivision" to provide that it does not preclude different owners of adjacent parcels from entering into a valid and enforceable boundary line agreement with one another so long as such agreement is only used to resolve a bona fide property line dispute, the boundary adjustment does not move by more than 250 feet from the center of the current platted line or alter either parcel's resultant acreage by more than five percent of the smaller parcel size, and such agreement does not create an additional lot, alter the existing boundary lines of localities, result in greater street frontage, or interfere with a recorded easement, and such agreement shall not result in any nonconformity with local ordinances and health department regulations. The bill also provides that for any property affected by this definition, any division of land subject to a partition suit by virtue of order or decree by a court of competent jurisdiction shall take precedence over the requirements of certain existing subdivision provisions and the minimum lot area, width, or frontage requirements in the zoning ordinance so long as the lot or parcel resulting from such order or decree does not vary from minimum lot area, width, or frontage requirements by more than 20 percent. Planning; subdivision of land and zoning. Changes the definition of "subdivision" to provide that it does not preclude different owners of adjacent parcels from entering into a valid and enforceable boundary line agreement with one another so long as such agreement is only used to resolve a bona fide property line dispute, the boundary adjustment does not move by more than 250 feet from the center of the current platted line or alter either parcel's resultant acreage by more than five percent of the smaller parcel size, and such agreement does not create an additional lot, alter the existing boundary lines of localities, result in greater street frontage, or interfere with a recorded easement, and such agreement shall not result in any nonconformity with local ordinances and health department regulations. The bill also provides that for any property affected by this definition, any division of land subject to a partition suit by virtue of order or decree by a court of competent jurisdiction shall take precedence over the requirements of certain existing subdivision provisions and the minimum lot area, width, or frontage requirements in the zoning ordinance so long as the lot or parcel resulting from such order or decree does not vary from minimum lot area, width, or frontage requirements by more than 20 percent.
Title
Planning; definition of subdivision, boundary line agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1088ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103287D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1088E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103287D |