VA HB1087 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local taxation for solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less. Provides that generating equipment of solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall be taxable by a locality, at a rate determined by such locality, but shall not exceed the real estate rate applicable in that locality, and that the exemption shall be as follows: 80 percent of the assessed value in the first five years in service after commencement of commercial operation, 70 percent of the assessed value in the second five years in service, and 60 percent of the assessed value for all remaining years in service. The bill also provides that (i) solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall not be exempt from the assessment of a revenue share by ordinance of that locality and (ii) nothing in the bill shall be construed to authorize local taxation of generating or storage equipment of solar photovoltaic projects that serve the electricity needs of that property upon which such solar facilities are located. The bill does not apply to projects five megawatts or less that were approved by a locality prior to July 1, 2022. Local taxation for solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less. Provides that generating equipment of solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall be taxable by a locality, at a rate determined by such locality, but shall not exceed the real estate rate applicable in that locality, and that the exemption shall be as follows: 80 percent of the assessed value in the first five years in service after commencement of commercial operation, 70 percent of the assessed value in the second five years in service, and 60 percent of the assessed value for all remaining years in service. The bill also provides that (i) solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall not be exempt from the assessment of a revenue share by ordinance of that locality and (ii) nothing in the bill shall be construed to authorize local taxation of generating or storage equipment of solar photovoltaic projects that serve the electricity needs of that property upon which such solar facilities are located. The bill does not apply to projects five megawatts or less that were approved by a locality prior to July 1, 2022.
Title
Solar photovoltaic projects; local taxation for projects less than five megawatts or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1087ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 25-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106830D-S1 (73-Y 25-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1087S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106830D-S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106830D-S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1087H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105585D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105585D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103947D |