VA HB1086 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic registration of certificates of death. Requires electronic filing of certificates of death, including the medical certification portion, using the electronic death registration system established by the Department of Health and provides for the filing of certificates of death with any registrar in the Commonwealth. Current law requires that certificates of death be filed with the registrar for the district in which the death occurred.
Title
Certificates of death; electronic registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103630D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1086 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1086+hil |