VA HB1086 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special education; full-time virtual school programs. Requires each local school board to provide free and appropriate special education for each student with a disability who attends a full-time virtual school program in the school division but resides in another school division in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that the school division in which the student resides shall (i) be released from the obligation to provide free and appropriate special education for such student and (ii) transfer to the school division in which the student attends a full-time virtual school program state and federal funds for the education of such students.
Title
Special education; full-time virtual school programs.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] |
Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1086ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1086H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104783D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104783D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103359D |