VA HB1086 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive services; local match rates. Provides that local match rates for purchase of services, including public and private residential and nonresidential services, pursuant to the Comprehensive Services Act shall be consistent, regardless of the location or nature of the services purchased.
Title
Comprehensive services; local match rates for purchase of services shall be consistent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources | |
2010-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101767D |