VA HB1084 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local license taxes; limitation of authority. Prohibits a locality from imposing a license tax on a director of a bank or trust company that is subject to the bank franchise tax.
Title
License taxes, local; limitation of authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1084ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102939D |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
SB385 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
SB385 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)