VA HB1080 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 @ 8:00 am in Senate Room A Pocahontas Building
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Firearms or other weapons on school property. Provides that no school board may authorize or designate any person to possess a firearm on school property other than those persons expressly authorized by statute. The bill also clarifies that no exemption exists for a special conservator of the peace to possess a firearm or other weapon on school property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms or other weapons; unauthorized to possess on school property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104100D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221280.2:4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback