VA HB108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Correctional officers; survey upon resignation, etc.; report. Requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the results of the survey administered to each correctional officer who resigns, is terminated, or is transitioned to a position other than correctional officer for the purpose of evaluating employment conditions and factors that contribute to or impede the retention of correctional officers.
Title
Correctional officers; survey upon resignation, etc., report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101309D |