VA HB1079 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local department; human resources. Requires every local department to (i) establish a human resources staff position to receive complaints regarding human resources matters and assist employees of the local department with resolution of such complaints and (ii) ensure that individuals with supervisory authority are prohibited from interfering in the investigation or resolution of such complaints.
Title
Local department; establishing human resources staff position, etc.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103986D |