VA HB1078 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1078

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Limitations on use or transfer of firearms. Provides that certain provisions related to the sale or transfer of firearms do not prohibit the lawful transfer of firearms between certain family members. The bill also removes the brandishing of a firearm in such manner as to reasonably induce fear in the mind of another while assembled with one or more persons for the purpose of and with the intent to intimidate any person or group of persons from actions constituting the offense of unlawful paramilitary activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; limitations on use or transfer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-11-22HouseLeft in Public Safety
2022-02-11HouseContinued to 2023 with substitute in Public Safety by voice vote
2022-02-10HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 with substitute by voice vote
2022-02-01HouseAssigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
2022-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2022-01-28HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2022-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103855D

Same As/Similar To

HB1078 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - Continued to 2023 with substitute in Public Safety by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
182433.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback