VA HB1078 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fairfax County; retirement. Requires Fairfax County to exclude members of its retirement system who are elected officials from participating in its Deferred Retirement Option Program ("DROP").
Title
Deferred Retirement Option Program; Fairfax County to exclude elected officials from participating.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2012-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-25 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2012-01-20 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100637D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1078 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1078+hil |