VA HB1074 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy portfolio standard; eligibility of hydrogen and nuclear resources. Provides that, for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard, eligible sources include (i) hydrogen resources that are produced from zero-carbon generating facilities located in the Commonwealth and (ii) zero-carbon nuclear generating facilities located in the Commonwealth that were placed into service after July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy portfolio standard; eligibility of hydrogen and nuclear resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13HouseLeft in Labor and Commerce
2024-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N)
2024-01-23HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2024-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2024-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102275D

Same As/Similar To

SB557 (Similar To) 2024-01-23 - Continued to 2025 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback