VA HB1073 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; valuation of residential rental apartments. Requires that, in any appeal to a board of equalization concerning the fair market value of residential apartments in excess of four units, the board use the income approach to valuation, unless certain specified exceptions exist. Criteria to be used in making this determination include actual gross income generated, losses due to vacancies, collection losses, and rent concessions, as well as actual operating expenses and expenditures. The bill contains an emergency clause and is effective for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2012.
Title
Residential rental properties; appeal of real property assessments, fair market value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 4/4/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1073ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1073H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105130D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105130D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/12 12103412D |
Same As/Similar To
SB73 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)