VA HB1072 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of profane, threatening, or indecent language over public airways or by other methods. Provides that using obscene, vulgar, profane, lewd, lascivious, or indecent language, with the intent to coerce, intimidate, or harass any person, over any telephone or citizens band radio is no longer a crime punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Profane, threatening, or indecent language; use over public airways or by other methods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101995D |