VA HB1072 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; no excuse. Allows for any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in any election in which he is qualified to vote. The bill removes the current list of statutory reasons for which a person may be entitled to vote by absentee ballot and consolidates multiple sections relating to absentee voting by uniformed and overseas voters into one section and multiple sections related to absentee voting by persons with a disability into one section.
Title
Absentee voting; no excuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103012D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |