VA HB1068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Pharmacy; regulations related to pharmacy outsourcing and pharmacy technician remote database access. Directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations related to pharmacy outsourcing and pharmacy technician remote database access. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Board of Pharmacy; regulations related to pharmacy outsourcing and pharmacy technician remote database access. Directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations related to pharmacy outsourcing and pharmacy technician remote database access. The bill directs the Board to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Pharmacy outsourcing and pharmacy technician remote database access; regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 407 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1068ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107659D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1068S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107659D-S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107659D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health Professions |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1068H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107286D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107286D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Health |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102395D |
Same As/Similar To
SB607 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Databases
Pharmacies
Prescription Medicines
Uncodified Legislation
Databases
Pharmacies
Prescription Medicines
Uncodified Legislation