VA HB1066 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; uniform general studies certificate. Requires the development of a uniform certificate of general studies program by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in consultation with the Virginia Community College System and Virginia public institutions of higher education, to be offered at each community college in Virginia. The program must ensure that a community college student who completes the one-year certificate program may transfer all credits to a four-year public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth, upon acceptance to the institution.
Title
Higher Education, State Council of; develop uniform certificate of general studies program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1066ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102975D-E | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1066E | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Education with amendments (14-Y 7-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102975D |