VA HB1065 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of police and court records; possession of marijuana. Allows a person convicted of possession of marijuana, or charged with such offense which charge was deferred and dismissed, who has successfully completed all terms of probation to file a petition for expungement after at least five years have passed since the date of conviction. Any conviction that is expunged will be considered a prior conviction for purposes of prosecution of any subsequent offense for which the prior conviction statutorily enhances punishment.
Title
Marijuana; convicted of possession, expungement of police and court records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102825D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |