VA HB1063 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Common-law crime of suicide. Abolishes the common-law crime of suicide. Suicide is currently a common-law crime in Virginia, although there is no statutorily prescribed punishment.
Title
Suicide; abolishes the common-law crime.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice Civil subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100984D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)