VA HB1063 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession. Decriminalizes marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $250 for a first violation and $1,000 for a second or subsequent violation. Under current law, a first offense is punishable by a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum jail sentence of 30 days, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill creates a rebuttable presumption that a person who possesses no more than one-half ounce of marijuana possesses it for personal use and provides that the existing suspended sentence and substance abuse screening provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a minor. The bill decreases the penalty for distribution or possession with intent to sell more than one-half but not more than five pounds of marijuana from a Class 5 felony to a Class 6 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; decriminalization of simple possession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100370D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161260(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182252(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182460(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.22(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback