VA HB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; campaign finance; committee depositories and reimbursement. Clarifies that committee treasurers may pay expenses by electronic debit drawn on a designated committee depository. Current law only allows for a check drawn on such depository. The bill also clarifies that reimbursements may be made for electronic debit payments made by an authorized committee representative. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Campaign finance; committee depositories and reimbursement.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 349 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1061ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-23 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101981D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 947.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 949.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 951.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 952.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |