VA HB1061 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; Department of Corrections-issued and jailer-issued identification. Provides that the Department of Corrections may establish a procedure for securing a government-issued identification card, birth certificate, or Social Security card through the Department of Motor Vehicles and that the Department of Motor Vehicles shall expedite the processing of an application submitted by a prisoner for such government-issued identification card and the issuance of such identification. The bill also requires the Department of Corrections, in coordination with the State Board of Local and Regional Jails, the Department of Motor Vehicles, and the State Registrar of Vital Records, to (i) review the processes involved in assisting a prisoner in applying for and obtaining a government-issued identification card, birth certificate, or Social Security card; (ii) identify any obstacles that may interfere with a prisoner obtaining such identification or documents prior to such prisoner's release or discharge; and (iii) issue a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2024.
Title
Prisoners; Department of Corrections- and jailer-issued identification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Incorporated by Public Safety |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1405-Cousins) by voice vote |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101367D |
Subjects
Corrections Board of or Department of
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 116.1:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 31.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |