VA HB1060 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Receipt of critically missing adult reports; Virginia Critically Missing Adult Alert Program; definition. Expands the definition of "critically missing adult" to include any missing adult, including an adult who has a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or mental illness, 18 years of age or older for the purpose of receipt of critically missing adult reports by a police or sheriff's department and the Virginia Critically Missing Adult Alert Program administered by the Department of State Police and removes from the Program the eligibility requirement that the adult is believed to have been abducted.
Title
Critically missing adult; expands definition, receipt of reports.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] | Del. Jackie Glass [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1060ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107613D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-07 | House | Delegates: Cordoza, Batten, Hope |
2022-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Mason, Hanger |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 97-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106698D-S (1-Y 97-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1060S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106698D-S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106698D-S1 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101788D |
Same As/Similar To
SB49 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
SB49 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
SB49 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)