VA HB1059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Discharge of deleterious substance into state waters; notice. Requires any person who unlawfully discharges any deleterious substance into state waters to give written notice to the State Water Control Board. Current law requires written notice to be given only to the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill also requires the Board or the Department to give the reported discharge information to local newspapers, television stations, and radio stations as soon as practicable after receiving it.
Title
Deleterious substances; discharge into state waters.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101616D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.19:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |