VA HB1056 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Determination of status of unclaimed cremains belonging to veterans. Provides that prior to the disposal of any unclaimed cremains, a funeral director must submit the name and any other identifying information for such cremains to the Department of Veterans Services for the purposes of determining whether the unclaimed cremains are those of a veteran. Under the bill, the names and any personal identifying information submitted by a funeral director to the Department of Veterans Services are exempt from disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (§2.2-3700 et seq.).
Title
Veterans; determination of status of unclaimed cremains.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. John Cox [R] | Del. Mark Dudenhefer [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] |
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Christopher Stolle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103438D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2808.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2808.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1056 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1056+hil |