VA HB1056 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animal control officers. Clarifies the duties and responsibilities of animal control officers, who shall be sworn law-enforcement officers with jurisdiction over animal control and protection laws. All sheriffs, police officers, conservation police officers, or other peace officers of the Commonwealth shall be ex officio animal control officers. When in uniform or upon displaying a badge or other credentials of office, animal control officers and deputy animal control officers shall have the power to issue a summons or obtain and execute a search warrant or a felony warrant as necessary. Currently, felony warrants must be executed by police officers. Localities must notify the State Veterinarian within 30 days of any change in the employment and training status of the animal control officers employed by the locality. Such reporting does not currently need to be done within a specific timeframe.
Title
Animal control officers; clarifies duties and responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-03 | House: Continued to 2011 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102055D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1056 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1056+hil |