VA HB1055 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; firearms safety courses. Clarifies that in order to serve as proof of demonstrated competence with a handgun for purposes of obtaining a concealed handgun permit, a firearms safety or training course must utilize firearms instructors certified by the National Rifle Association or the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; completion of firearms safety courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14102595D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1055 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1055+hil |