VA HB105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services training standards; community engaged policing. Expands the responsibilities of the Department of Criminal Justice Services regarding community policing by requiring the compulsory training standards for basic training and recertification of law-enforcement officers to include fair and impartial policing, verbal de-escalation, and needs of special populations. The bill changes the term "community policing" to "community engaged policing."
Title
Criminal Justice Services, Department of; training standards, community engaged policing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100940D |