VA HB1041 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; in-state tuition; children of active duty service members or veterans. Provides that any child of an active duty service member or veteran who claims Virginia as his home state and filed Virginia tax returns for at least two years during active duty service is eligible for in-state tuition charges, regardless of domicile. Under current law, any such child is eligible for in-state tuition charges if such service member or veteran claims Virginia as his home state and filed Virginia tax returns for at least 10 years during active duty service.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; in-state tuition, children of active duty service members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103809D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Tuition
Veterans
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Tuition
Veterans