VA HB1041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; lot owner rights. Provides lot owners the right to be informed of the count and outcome of a vote on any matter requiring a vote by a property owners' association's membership in proportion to the lot owner's ownership interest. The bill removes the requirement that a recording of a meeting of the board of directors by a lot owner be by audio or visual means.
Title
Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; lot owner rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Motion to pass by for the day rejected |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102784D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1041E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102784D |