VA HB1038 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Solid waste management facility; permit for landfill with capacity of more than 35 million tons. Prohibits the Virginia Waste Management Board from issuing (i) a permit for a new solid waste management facility or (ii) an amendment to a permit allowing the expansion of a facility or an increase in capacity, where such permit or amendment is likely to result in the creation of a landfill whose capacity exceeds 35 million tons. For the Board to issue such a permit or amendment, the bill requires the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to determine that the amount of capacity in excess of 35 million tons will serve a public interest that outweighs any additional harms to human health and safety and the environment caused by such capacity in excess of 35 million tons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste management facility; permit for landfill with capacity of more than 35 million tons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseContinued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-10HousePursuant to House Rule 22
2020-02-10HouseRereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-10HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107743D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-05HouseReconsidered by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (10-Y 12-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102113D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011408.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback