VA HB1037 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Committee substitute printed 20108499D-S1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; short-term limited-duration medical plans. Prohibits carriers from issuing in the Commonwealth any short-term limited-duration medical plan with a duration that exceeds three months or that can be renewed or extended, except for a one-time nonconsecutive renewal, or if the plan's issuance would result in a covered person being covered by a short-term limited-duration medical plan for more than six months in any 12-month period. The measure prohibits a carrier from issuing a short-term limited-duration medical plan during an annual open enrollment period and has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; short-term limited-duration medical plans, definitions, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108499D-S1
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1037H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107200D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107200D-H1
2020-02-04HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102769D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.21(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback