VA HB1035 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Attorneys for the Commonwealth; compensation and collection Attorneys for the Commonwealth; compensation and collection of fees. Prohibits the Compensation Board, when determining staffing and funding levels for offices of attorneys for the Commonwealth, from (i) considering the number of charges brought or the number of convictions obtained by such attorney for the Commonwealth; (ii) relying on standards devised or recommended by the attorney for the Commonwealth, law-enforcement agencies, or professional associations representing attorneys for the Commonwealth or law-enforcement officers; or (iii) using measures that increase if an attorney for the Commonwealth (a) elects to prosecute a more serious charge, (b) elects to prosecute additional charges from a single arrest or criminal incident, (c) obtains convictions rather than dismissing charges or offering reduced charges, or (d) proceeds with prosecution rather than diversion. The bill also requires attorneys for the Commonwealth to pay all fees collected by them in consideration of the performance of official duties or functions into the state treasury, instead of only half of such fees. The bill requires the State Treasurer to pay to the treasuries of the respective counties and cities of the attorneys for the Commonwealth a proportion of half of all such fees collected by all attorneys for the Commonwealth, as determined by each county or city's crime rate, criminal incident rate, or arrest rate. Finally, the bill changes the fees collected by attorneys for the Commonwealth on trials of felony indictments from $40 on each count to $120 for each trial of a Class 1 or Class 2 felony indictment, or other felony that carries a possible penalty of life in prison, except robbery, and $40 for each trial on robbery and all other felony indictments regardless of the number of counts. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Attorneys for the Commonwealth; compensation and collection of fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-07 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102861D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1035 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1626 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1627.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1627.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1636.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1035 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1035+hil |