VA HB1029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wildlife Corridor Grant Fund; established; report. Establishes the Wildlife Corridor Grant Fund to provide grants for projects that reduce vehicle crashes involving wildlife and improve habitat connectivity for terrestrial and aquatic wildlife. High priority projects as set forth in the Wildlife Corridor Action Plan will be funded. The Director of the Department of Wildlife Resources is directed to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1 of each year concerning funding of the Fund and award of grants from the Fund.
Title
Wildlife Corridor Grant Fund; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104257D |